AL HB253 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-22 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-22 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Paroles and probation, revocation hearing, disputed positive urine or blood tests, testing agency required to verify through confirmation test, individual requesting responsible for testing costs (2010-20174)
Title
Paroles and probation, revocation hearing, disputed positive urine or blood tests, testing agency required to verify through confirmation test, individual requesting responsible for testing costs (2010-20174)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-22 | Further Consideration | |
2010-04-22 | Keahey request to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair Granted. | |
2010-04-22 | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair | |
2010-03-25 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-03-11 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary | |
2010-03-11 | Engrossed | |
2010-03-11 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 549 | |
2010-03-11 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 548 | |
2010-03-11 | Judiciary first Substitute Offered | |
2010-03-11 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-17 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2010-01-14 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |