AL HB256 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law enforcement, further provides for reimbursement for transporting for extradition
Title
Law enforcement, further provides for reimbursement for transporting for extradition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 1194 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | House | Enacted |
2024-05-16 | House | Enacted |
2024-05-09 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2024-05-08 | House | Enrolled |
2024-05-08 | House | Ready to Enroll |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1194 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Pending Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2024-03-21 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 299 |
2024-03-21 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-03-07 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-03-06 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-28 | House | Pending House Ways and Means General Fund |
2024-02-28 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means General Fund |