AL HB280 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-03 - Delivered to Governor at 5:05 p.m. on May 3, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-03 - Delivered to Governor at 5:05 p.m. on May 3, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Foley, corp. limits alt.
Title
Foley, corp. limits alt.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 26 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 26 Abs: 30) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | Delivered to Governor at 5:05 p.m. on May 3, 2011 | |
2011-05-03 | Assigned Act No. 2011-241. | |
2011-05-03 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-05-03 | Signature Requested | |
2011-05-03 | Enrolled | |
2011-05-03 | Passed Second House | |
2011-05-03 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 464 | |
2011-05-03 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-21 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-03-31 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2011-03-29 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 81 | |
2011-03-29 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-24 | Acted on by Baldwin County Legislation as Favorable | |
2011-03-22 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation |