AL HB296 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to the United States Armed Forces; to include the United States Space Force in all collective references to the United States Armed Forces.
Title
Relating to the United States Armed Forces; to include the United States Space Force in all collective references to the United States Armed Forces.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-18 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-23 | House | Enacted |
2023-05-23 | House | Enrolled |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Ready to Enroll |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-05-18 | Senate | On Third Reading in Second House |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Veterans and Military Affairs |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee to Senate Veterans and Military Affairs |
2023-05-03 | House | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-05-02 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-05-02 | House | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-04-19 | House | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-04-19 | House | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-04-19 | House | Reported Favorably from House Military and Veterans Affairs |
2023-04-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to House Military and Veterans Affairs |
2023-04-12 | House | Read First Time in House of Origin |