AL HB314 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Delivered to Governor at 8:39 p.m. on May 17, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Delivered to Governor at 8:39 p.m. on May 17, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Small loans under Ala. Small Loan Act, minimum and maximum amount of loans increased and corresponding interest rates, max term of loans, Secs. 5-18-4, 5-18-10, 5-18-13, 5-18-15 am'd.
Title
Small loans under Ala. Small Loan Act, minimum and maximum amount of loans increased and corresponding interest rates, max term of loans, Secs. 5-18-4, 5-18-10, 5-18-13, 5-18-15 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Johnson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Holmes (A) motion to Carry Over Until 25th leg day Time (Y: 9 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 44) [FAIL]
2017-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 7 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Holmes (A) motion to Carry Over Until 26th leg day (Y: 9 N: 71 NV: 4 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2017-05-04 - House - Holmes (A) motion to Carry Over Until 25th leg day Time (Y: 9 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 44) [FAIL]
2017-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 7 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Holmes (A) motion to Carry Over Until 26th leg day (Y: 9 N: 71 NV: 4 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | House | Delivered to Governor at 8:39 p.m. on May 17, 2017. |
2017-05-17 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-373. |
2017-05-17 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-05-17 | House | Enrolled |
2017-05-17 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1216 |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance |
2017-05-04 | House | Holmes (A) motion to Carry Over Until 25th leg day Time lost Roll Call 823 |
2017-05-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 824 |
2017-05-04 | House | Holmes (A) motion to Carry Over Until 26th leg day lost Roll Call 822 |
2017-05-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Financial Services |