AL HB333 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-14 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections
Pending: Senate Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-14 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections
Pending: Senate Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Elections, computerized statewide voter registration list, residential address of domestic violence victims omitted, Sec. 17-4-33 am'd.
Title
Elections, computerized statewide voter registration list, residential address of domestic violence victims omitted, Sec. 17-4-33 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections | |
2010-04-13 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 979 | |
2010-04-13 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-01-28 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-01-19 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution and Elections |