AL HB345 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Delivered to Governor at 1:49 p.m. on March 17, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Delivered to Governor at 1:49 p.m. on March 17, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
St. Clair Co., sheriff, service of process, fee established, St. Clair Co. Sheriff's Service of Process Fee Fund, established
Title
St. Clair Co., sheriff, service of process, fee established, St. Clair Co. Sheriff's Service of Process Fee Fund, established
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 636 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - SBIR: Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 635 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 303 (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 83 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-02-24 - House - HBIR: Hill motion to Adopt Roll Call 302 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 68 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-17 - Senate - SBIR: Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 635 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 303 (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 83 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-02-24 - House - HBIR: Hill motion to Adopt Roll Call 302 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 68 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:49 p.m. on March 17, 2022. |
2022-03-17 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-193. |
2022-03-17 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-03-17 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-03-17 | House | Passed Second House |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 636 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2022-02-24 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 303 |
2022-02-24 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |