AL HB394 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FY24 Alabama Building Renovation Finance Authority Bill
Title
FY24 Alabama Building Renovation Finance Authority Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 1081 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Pending Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2024-05-02 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1081 |
2024-05-02 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-11 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-10 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-04-02 | House | Pending House Ways and Means General Fund |
2024-04-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
Same As/Similar To
SB272 (Same As) 2024-05-07 - Currently Indefinitely Postponed