AL HB417 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Delivered to Governor at 10:20 a.m. on April 8, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Delivered to Governor at 10:20 a.m. on April 8, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Baldwin Co., personnel appeals board for county employees, election procedures, evaluation of contract employees, Secs. 45-2-120.08, 45-2-120.12 am'd.
Title
Baldwin Co., personnel appeals board for county employees, election procedures, evaluation of contract employees, Secs. 45-2-120.08, 45-2-120.12 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Baker [R] | Rep. Randy Davis [R] | Rep. Joe Faust [R] | Rep. Steve McMillan [R] |
Rep. Harry Shiver [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 31) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | Delivered to Governor at 10:20 a.m. on April 8, 2010. | |
2010-04-08 | Assigned Act No. 2010-566. | |
2010-04-08 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2010-04-08 | Signature Requested | |
2010-04-06 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-06 | Passed Second House | |
2010-04-06 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 674 | |
2010-04-06 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-11 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2010-03-25 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-03-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 442 | |
2010-03-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-25 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-01-26 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation |