AL HB474 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles, exhibition driving, further provided; automated traffic enforcement system, authorized to be used to detect and record violations; impoundment period, further provided
Title
Motor vehicles, exhibition driving, further provided; automated traffic enforcement system, authorized to be used to detect and record violations; impoundment period, further provided
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 1160 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 915 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 915 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | House | Enacted |
2024-05-09 | House | Enacted |
2024-05-08 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2024-05-08 | House | Enrolled |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2024-05-08 | House | Ready to Enroll |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1160 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Pending Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2024-04-30 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 915 |
2024-04-30 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-25 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-24 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-04-23 | House | Pending House Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2024-04-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |