AL HB498 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Forwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 10:25 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Forwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 10:25 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Crenshaw Co., Superintendent of Education to be appointed by the co. board of education, Sec. 45-21-100 repealed
Title
Crenshaw Co., Superintendent of Education to be appointed by the co. board of education, Sec. 45-21-100 repealed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - Senate - Dial table Dial motion to recommit (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Whatley to table Smitherman motion to rerefer (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 34 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - Senate - Dial table Dial motion to recommit (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Whatley to table Smitherman motion to rerefer (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 34 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Forwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 10:25 p.m. on May 20, 2013. |
2013-05-20 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-362. |
2013-05-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1139 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Dial table Dial motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 939 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Whatley to table Smitherman motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 583 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Smitherman motion to rerefer |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |
2013-04-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 465 |
2013-04-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-04 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |