AL HB498 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-15 - Pending third reading on day 24 Favorable from Education Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-15 - Pending third reading on day 24 Favorable from Education Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alabama Credential Quality and Transparency Act and Workforce Council Committee on Credential Quality and Transparency created, legislative findings, free database of searchable online info re educational and occupational credentials and competencies provided, Secs. 41-29-350 to 41-29-357 added.
Title
Alabama Credential Quality and Transparency Act and Workforce Council Committee on Credential Quality and Transparency created, legislative findings, free database of searchable online info re educational and occupational credentials and competencies provided, Secs. 41-29-350 to 41-29-357 added.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 575 (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - HBIR: Collins motion to Adopt Roll Call 574 (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - HBIR: Collins motion to Adopt Roll Call 574 (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 24 Favorable from Education Policy |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy |
2021-04-01 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 575 |
2021-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 29 | 350 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 29 | 351 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 29 | 352 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 29 | 353 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 29 | 354 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 29 | 355 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 29 | 356 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 29 | 357 | New Code | See Bill Text |