AL HB529 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Delivered to Governor at 6:26 p.m. on May 31, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Delivered to Governor at 6:26 p.m. on May 31, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Courts, circuit and district court judges, qualifications, min times of state licensure to practice law without professional disciplinary actions, Secs. 12-11-1, 12-12-1 am'd.
Title
Courts, circuit and district court judges, qualifications, min times of state licensure to practice law without professional disciplinary actions, Secs. 12-11-1, 12-12-1 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - House - Faulkner motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Givhan motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 80 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Faulkner motion to Table (Y: 70 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 76 N: 5 NV: 18 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 81 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 83 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Givhan motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 80 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Faulkner motion to Table (Y: 70 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 76 N: 5 NV: 18 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 81 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 83 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | House | Delivered to Governor at 6:26 p.m. on May 31, 2019. |
2019-05-31 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-539. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Judiciary first Substitute Offered |
2019-05-31 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-31 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2019-05-31 | House | Faulkner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1287 |
2019-05-31 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1458 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1457 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Smitherman Amendment Offered |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Givhan motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1456 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Judiciary zeroeth Substitute Offered |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Ward motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2019-05-15 | House | Engrossed |
2019-05-15 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 727 |
2019-05-15 | House | Faulkner motion to Table adopted Roll Call 726 |
2019-05-15 | House | Givan Amendment Offered |
2019-05-15 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 725 |
2019-05-15 | House | Sorrell 2nd Amendment Offered |
2019-05-15 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 724 |
2019-05-15 | House | Sorrell Amendment Offered |
2019-05-15 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 723 |
2019-05-15 | House | Wadsworth Amendment Offered |
2019-05-15 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-14 | House | Third Reading Carried Over |
2019-05-08 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-30 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |