AL HB565 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Assigned Act No. 2019-409.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Assigned Act No. 2019-409.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Bail bonds, Alabama Bail Bond Regulatory Act, Professional Bail Bonding Board created, licensure of bondsmen and recovery agents, continuing education, penalties
Title
Bail bonds, Alabama Bail Bond Regulatory Act, Professional Bail Bonding Board created, licensure of bondsmen and recovery agents, continuing education, penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - House - Hill motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-409. |
2019-05-29 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:33 p.m. on May 29, 2019. |
2019-05-29 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2019-05-28 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-28 | House | Hill motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1092 |
2019-05-28 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1104 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Singleton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1103 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Singleton Amendment Offered |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2019-05-15 | House | Engrossed |
2019-05-15 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 754 |
2019-05-15 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 753 |
2019-05-15 | House | Boards, Agencies and Commissions 2nd Amendment Offered |
2019-05-15 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 752 |
2019-05-15 | House | Boards, Agencies and Commissions 1st Amendment Offered |
2019-05-15 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-08 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments |
2019-05-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |