AL HB63 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal procedure; split sentence authorized for 30 year sentence
Title
Criminal procedure; split sentence authorized for 30 year sentence
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 745 (Y: 60 N: 34 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 744 36HPEEV-1 (Y: 70 N: 20 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 82 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 744 36HPEEV-1 (Y: 70 N: 20 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 82 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Pending Senate Judiciary |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2024-04-23 | House | Engrossed |
2024-04-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 745 |
2024-04-23 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 744 36HPEEV-1 |
2024-04-23 | House | Judiciary Engrossed Substitute Offered 36HPEEV-1 |
2024-04-23 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-21 | House | Committee Engrossed Substitute Adopted 36HPEEV-1 |
2024-02-21 | House | Committee Amendment Adopted V1UEVPP-1 |
2024-02-22 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-21 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-06 | House | Pending House Judiciary |
2024-02-06 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Judiciary |
2024-01-30 | House | Prefiled |