AL HB736 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 1:40 p.m. on April 22, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 1:40 p.m. on April 22, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Morgan Co., Hartselle, Falkville, and Decatur, bingo further defined, bingo permit holders authorized to advertise bingo sessions with municipal governing body approval, Act 96-648, 1996 Reg. Sess. am'd.
Title
Morgan Co., Hartselle, Falkville, and Decatur, bingo further defined, bingo permit holders authorized to advertise bingo sessions with municipal governing body approval, Act 96-648, 1996 Reg. Sess. am'd.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-22 | Delivered to Governor at 1:40 p.m. on April 22, 2010. | |
2010-04-22 | Assigned Act No. 2010-718. | |
2010-04-22 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2010-04-22 | Signature Requested | |
2010-04-22 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-22 | Passed Second House | |
2010-04-22 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1173 | |
2010-04-22 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-21 | Reported from Committee | |
2010-04-01 | Read for the second time and pursuant to Rule 50 rereferred to committee Tourism and Marketing. | |
2010-03-30 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2010-03-30 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 690 | |
2010-03-30 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-25 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-03-23 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |