AL HB802 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 13 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - Forwarded to Governor at 3:51 p.m. on April 13, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 13 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - Forwarded to Governor at 3:51 p.m. on April 13, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Wilcox Co., ad valorem tax, county commission authorized to levy, distrib. for fire protection, referendum
Title
Wilcox Co., ad valorem tax, county commission authorized to levy, distrib. for fire protection, referendum
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Forwarded to Governor at 3:51 p.m. on April 13, 2010. | |
2010-04-13 | Message from the Governor with Veto Message | |
2010-04-13 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2010-04-13 | Signature Requested | |
2010-04-13 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-13 | Passed Second House | |
2010-04-13 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1019 | |
2010-04-13 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-04-06 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2010-04-06 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 835 | |
2010-04-06 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-06 | Thomas (J) motion to Suspend Rules adopted Roll Call 833 | |
2010-04-01 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-03-30 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |