AL HB85 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-25 - Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Veterans and Military Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-25 - Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Veterans and Military Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Unemployment compensation, benefits for active duty military dependent spouses who quit work in order to relocate due to spouse's change of station orders, activation orders, or unit deployment orders, authorized, Sec. 25-4-78 am'd.
Title
Unemployment compensation, benefits for active duty military dependent spouses who quit work in order to relocate due to spouse's change of station orders, activation orders, or unit deployment orders, authorized, Sec. 25-4-78 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-25 | Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Veterans and Military Affairs | |
2011-05-25 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-24 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs | |
2011-05-05 | Bridges intended to cosponsor | |
2011-05-05 | Engrossed | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 707 | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 706 | |
2011-05-05 | Military and Veterans Affairs Amendment Offered | |
2011-05-05 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-09 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2011-03-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Military and Veterans' Affairs |