AL HB85 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-02 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 962
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-02 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 962
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Marion County, creates service of process fee
Title
Marion County, creates service of process fee
Sponsors
Rep. Tracy Estes [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 962 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Gudger motion to Adopt - Roll Call 961 BPWFQ4Q-1 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 58 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-02-21 - House - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 58 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-02-21 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 83 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Gudger motion to Adopt - Roll Call 961 BPWFQ4Q-1 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 58 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-02-21 - House - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 58 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-02-21 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 83 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 962 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Gudger motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 961 BPWFQ4Q-1 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Gudger 1st Amendment Offered BPWFQ4Q-1 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Carried Over to the Call of the Chair |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Pending Senate Local Legislation |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Local Legislation |
2024-02-21 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-21 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 59 |
2024-02-21 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-20 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-20 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-06 | House | Pending House Local Legislation |
2024-02-06 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Local Legislation |
2024-02-01 | House | Prefiled |