AL HB88 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - Pending third reading on day 14 Favorable from Business and Labor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - Pending third reading on day 14 Favorable from Business and Labor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Labor, unemployment compensation, individual weekly benefit payment, formula for calculating individual weekly benefit payment altered, Sec. 25-4-73 am'd.
Title
Labor, unemployment compensation, individual weekly benefit payment, formula for calculating individual weekly benefit payment altered, Sec. 25-4-73 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 74 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - Williams (J) motion to Table (Y: 30 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 45) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - Williams (J) motion to Table (Y: 30 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 45) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 14 Favorable from Business and Labor |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Business and Labor |
2014-01-30 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 90 |
2014-01-30 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-01-30 | House | Williams (J) motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote |
2014-01-30 | House | Williams (J) motion to Table adopted Roll Call 77 |
2014-01-30 | House | Henry motion to Carry Over Temporarily tabled |
2014-01-30 | House | Third Reading Carried Over |
2014-01-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business |