AL HJR404 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Delivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on May 26, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Delivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on May 26, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
U. S. Attorney General requested to study Tennessee Valley Authority Charter and Presidential Executive Orders regarding responsibility of Tennessee Valley Authority to control aquatic weeds in the Tennessee River Basin
Title
U. S. Attorney General requested to study Tennessee Valley Authority Charter and Presidential Executive Orders regarding responsibility of Tennessee Valley Authority to control aquatic weeds in the Tennessee River Basin
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Baughn [R] | Rep. Greg Burdine [D] | Rep. Terri Collins [R] | Rep. Lynn Greer [R] |
Rep. Ed Henry [R] | Rep. Ken Johnson [R] | Rep. Wayne Johnson [R] | Rep. Wes Long [R] |
Rep. Jim Patterson [R] | Rep. Kerry Rich [R] | Rep. John Robinson [D] | Rep. Dan Williams [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | Delivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on May 26, 2011. | |
2011-05-26 | Assigned Act No. 2011-345. | |
2011-05-26 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-05-26 | Signature Requested | |
2011-05-25 | Enrolled | |
2011-05-25 | Passed Second House | |
2011-05-25 | Beason motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2011-05-25 | Reported from Rules | |
2011-04-27 | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules | |
2011-04-26 | Galliher motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2011-04-26 | Reported from Rules | |
2011-04-21 | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |