AL HJR433 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 9:30 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 9:30 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alzheimer's Disease Task Force, established
Title
Alzheimer's Disease Task Force, established
Sponsors
Rep. Laura Hall [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-18 - House - Hall motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Delivered to Governor at 9:30 p. m. on May 16, 2012. | |
2012-05-16 | Rules first Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-16 | Assigned Act No. 2012-597. | |
2012-05-16 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-16 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-16 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-16 | Hall motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1578 | |
2012-05-16 | Concurrence Requested | |
2012-05-16 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | |
2012-05-16 | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-05-16 | Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-05-16 | Rules Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-16 | Reported from Rules 1 amendment | |
2012-05-03 | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules | |
2012-05-02 | Engrossed | |
2012-05-02 | Galliher motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-05-02 | Motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-05-02 | Rules Substitute Offered | |
2012-05-02 | Reported from Rules with 1 substitute and | |
2012-05-01 | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |