AL SB106 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commerce Department; secretary and deputy secretary salary revised
Title
Commerce Department; secretary and deputy secretary salary revised
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 421 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-12 | Senate | Enacted |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Enacted |
2024-04-09 | House | Signature Requested |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Ready to Enroll |
2024-04-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 421 |
2024-04-04 | House | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-03-21 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-03-20 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-02-27 | House | Pending House State Government |
2024-02-27 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on State Government |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 86 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Pending Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
Same As/Similar To
HB177 (Same As) 2024-04-25 - Carried Over