AL SB108 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-27 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-27 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to public contracts; to amend Sections 41-16-50, 41-16-51, 41-16-52, 41-16-53, 41-16-54, and 41-16-55, Code of Alabama 1975, to increase the threshold dollar amount for which competitive bidding is generally required for certain state and local public awarding authorities, with exceptions; to provide a legislative method for the increase of the threshold dollar amount; and in connection therewith would have as its purpose or effect the requirement of a new or increased expenditure of local funds within the meaning of Section 111.05 of the Constitution of Alabama of 2022.
Title
Relating to public contracts; to amend Sections 41-16-50, 41-16-51, 41-16-52, 41-16-53, 41-16-54, and 41-16-55, Code of Alabama 1975, to increase the threshold dollar amount for which competitive bidding is generally required for certain state and local public awarding authorities, with exceptions; to provide a legislative method for the increase of the threshold dollar amount; and in connection therewith would have as its purpose or effect the requirement of a new or increased expenditure of local funds within the meaning of Section 111.05 of the Constitution of Alabama of 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-27 | Senate | Enacted |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-04-27 | House | Ready to Enroll |
2023-04-27 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-04-27 | House | On Third Reading in Second House |
2023-04-19 | House | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-04-19 | House | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-04-19 | House | Reported Favorably from House State Government |
2023-04-06 | House | Referred to Committee to House State Government |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-04-06 | Senate | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate State Governmental Affairs |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Senate State Governmental Affairs |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Read First Time in House of Origin |