AL SB120 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-31 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-31 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to crimes; to amend Sections 13A-10-30, 13A-10-36, 13A-10-37, and 13A-10-38, Code of Alabama 1975, to allow a detention facility to adopt a policy to further define what items constitute "contraband" for purposes of banning certain items from detention facilities; to further define the crimes of promoting contraband in the first, second, and third degree to apply to juveniles under certain circumstances; to make nonsubstantive, technical revisions to update the existing code language to current style; and in connection therewith would have as its purpose or effect the requirement of a new or increased expenditure of local funds within the meaning of Section 111.05 of the Constitution of Alabama of 2022.
Title
Relating to crimes; to amend Sections 13A-10-30, 13A-10-36, 13A-10-37, and 13A-10-38, Code of Alabama 1975, to allow a detention facility to adopt a policy to further define what items constitute "contraband" for purposes of banning certain items from detention facilities; to further define the crimes of promoting contraband in the first, second, and third degree to apply to juveniles under certain circumstances; to make nonsubstantive, technical revisions to update the existing code language to current style; and in connection therewith would have as its purpose or effect the requirement of a new or increased expenditure of local funds within the meaning of Section 111.05 of the Constitution of Alabama of 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-18 - Senate - Concur In and Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 98 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - Adopt ZEJ2RK-1 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Read Again a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Adopt UBL3DG-1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 98 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - Adopt ZEJ2RK-1 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Read Again a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Adopt UBL3DG-1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-31 | Senate | Enacted |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Indefinitely Postpone |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Concur In and Adopt |
2023-05-18 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended |
2023-05-18 | House | Adopt ZEJ2RK-1 |
2023-05-18 | House | On Third Reading in Second House |
2023-05-03 | House | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-05-03 | House | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-05-03 | House | Reported Favorably from House Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2023-05-03 | House | Amendment/Substitute by House Public Safety and Homeland Security ZEJ2RK-1 |
2023-05-02 | House | Amendment/Substitute by House Public Safety and Homeland Security 85VAF2-1 |
2023-04-25 | House | Referred to Committee to House Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Read Again a Third Time and Pass as Amended |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Adopt UBL3DG-1 |
2023-04-25 | Senate | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Judiciary |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Read First Time in House of Origin |