AL SB122 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Assigned Act No. 2015-436.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Assigned Act No. 2015-436.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
General Fund Budget, line item established for Navigable Waters Dredging Fund
Title
General Fund Budget, line item established for Navigable Waters Dredging Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2015-436. |
2015-06-03 | House | Signature Requested |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2015-06-02 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1224 |
2015-06-02 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-14 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-05-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 688 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |