AL SB124 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Delivered to Governor at 12:12 p.m. on April 22, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Delivered to Governor at 12:12 p.m. on April 22, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Court Reporting, Board of continued until October 1, 2016, pursuant to Sunset Law
Title
Court Reporting, Board of continued until October 1, 2016, pursuant to Sunset Law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | Delivered to Governor at 12:12 p.m. on April 22, 2012 | |
2012-03-22 | Assigned Act No. 2012-111. | |
2012-03-22 | Signature Requested | |
2012-03-22 | Enrolled | |
2012-03-22 | Passed Second House | |
2012-03-22 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 480 | |
2012-03-22 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-20 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-03-15 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions | |
2012-03-15 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 300 | |
2012-03-15 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-01 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |