AL SB124 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Assigned Act No. 2021-100.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Assigned Act No. 2021-100.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Board of Medical Examiners and Medical Licensure Commission, confidentiality of board meetings, accreditation organizations updated, and requirements for a certificate of qualification, temporary certificates of qualification and licensing of physicians and assistants to physician in state under military orders, Secs. 34-24-70.1, 34-24-301.1 added; Secs. 34-24-60, 34-24-70, 34-24-297, 34-24-302, 34-24-337, 34-24-361 am'd.
Title
Board of Medical Examiners and Medical Licensure Commission, confidentiality of board meetings, accreditation organizations updated, and requirements for a certificate of qualification, temporary certificates of qualification and licensing of physicians and assistants to physician in state under military orders, Secs. 34-24-70.1, 34-24-301.1 added; Secs. 34-24-60, 34-24-70, 34-24-297, 34-24-302, 34-24-337, 34-24-361 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 270 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - HBIR: Meadows motion to Adopt Roll Call 269 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 48 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - SBIR: Chesteen motion to Adopt Roll Call 47 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - HBIR: Meadows motion to Adopt Roll Call 269 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 48 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - SBIR: Chesteen motion to Adopt Roll Call 47 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2021-100. |
2021-03-09 | House | Signature Requested |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2021-03-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 270 |
2021-03-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-10 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 48 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
34 | 24 | 297 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 24 | 301.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 24 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 24 | 337 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 24 | 361 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 24 | 60 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 24 | 70 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 24 | 70.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |