AL SB137 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-21 - Ethics and Campaign Finance first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-21 - Ethics and Campaign Finance first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Lobbying, prohibiting certain public officials from serving as a lobbyist for a two-year period, Secs. 36-25-13, 36-25-23 am'd.
Title
Lobbying, prohibiting certain public officials from serving as a lobbyist for a two-year period, Secs. 36-25-13, 36-25-23 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Del Marsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | House | Ethics and Campaign Finance first Substitute Offered |
2015-05-21 | House | Ethics and Campaign Finance first Amendment Offered |
2015-05-21 | House | Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from Ethics and Campaign Finance with 1 substitute and 1 amendment |
2015-05-21 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 1 amendment |
2015-05-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ethics and Campaign Finance |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Engrossed |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 683 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 682 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Constitution, Ethics and Elections first Substitute Offered |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Marsh motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Ethics and Elections |