AL SB139 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Assigned Act No. 2022-49.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Assigned Act No. 2022-49.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prattville, taxation, distribution of certain sales and use tax proceeds revised, Elmore County Commission to remit certain lodging tax proceeds to the City of Prattville, Secs. 45-1A-43, 45-26-246.05 am'd.
Title
Prattville, taxation, distribution of certain sales and use tax proceeds revised, Elmore County Commission to remit certain lodging tax proceeds to the City of Prattville, Secs. 45-1A-43, 45-26-246.05 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 181 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 80 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2022-02-16 - House - HBIR: Dismukes motion to Adopt Roll Call 180 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 62 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 101 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - SBIR: Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 100 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - HBIR: Dismukes motion to Adopt Roll Call 180 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 62 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 101 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - SBIR: Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 100 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2022-49. |
2022-02-17 | House | Signature Requested |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2022-02-16 | House | Lawrence intended to vote "Yea" |
2022-02-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 181 |
2022-02-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 101 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
Same As/Similar To
HB212 (Same As) 2022-02-09 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | 1A | 43 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 26 | 246.05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |