AL SB147 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-19 - Assigned Act No. 2016-153.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-19 - Assigned Act No. 2016-153.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Hunting, nighttime hunting, to be authorized by rule of Dept. of Conservation and Natural Resources, nighttime hours further defined for Chapter 11, Title 9, Sec. 9-11-235 am'd.
Title
Hunting, nighttime hunting, to be authorized by rule of Dept. of Conservation and Natural Resources, nighttime hours further defined for Chapter 11, Title 9, Sec. 9-11-235 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2016-153. |
2016-04-19 | House | Signature Requested |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2016-04-13 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 608 |
2016-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-03-10 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-03-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 294 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry |