AL SB150 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Forests and grasslands, arson, further defined to include the attempt to set fire to forests, grasses, or woodlands, possession of incendiary paraphernalia prohibited, reckless burning of property of another prohibited, penalty, Sec. 9-13-11 am'd.
Title
Forests and grasslands, arson, further defined to include the attempt to set fire to forests, grasses, or woodlands, possession of incendiary paraphernalia prohibited, reckless burning of property of another prohibited, penalty, Sec. 9-13-11 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Brooks [R] | Sen. Rusty Glover [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-14 | Forwarded to Governor on April 14, 2010 at 1:40 p.m. on April 14, 2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Assigned Act No. 2010-603. | |
2010-04-14 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-14 | Signature Requested | |
2010-04-14 | Second House Concurs in Executive Amendment | |
2010-04-13 | Thigpen intended to vote "Yea" | |
2010-04-13 | Wood motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 967 | |
2010-04-13 | House of Origin Concurs in Executive Amendment | |
2010-04-13 | Glover motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1049 | |
2010-04-13 | Executive Amendment Offered | |
2010-04-13 | Forwarded to Governor | |
2010-03-11 | Enrolled | |
2010-03-11 | Signature Requested | |
2010-03-09 | Passed Second House | |
2010-03-09 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 540 | |
2010-03-09 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-25 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-02-16 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary | |
2010-02-16 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 229 | |
2010-02-16 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-02 | Reported from Judiciary as Favorable | |
2010-01-12 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |