AL SB182 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State government, Office of Chief Procurement Officer, established, Division of Purchasing within the Dept. of Finance, eliminated, Secs. 41-4-110 to 41-4-161, inclusive, repealed; Secs. 41-4-110A to 41-4-116A, incl., 41-4-120A to 41-4-151A, incl., 41-4-155A, 41-4-160A to 41-4-168A, incl., 41-4-170 to 41-4-178A, incl., added; Sec. 41-4-66 am'd.
Title
State government, Office of Chief Procurement Officer, established, Division of Purchasing within the Dept. of Finance, eliminated, Secs. 41-4-110 to 41-4-161, inclusive, repealed; Secs. 41-4-110A to 41-4-116A, incl., 41-4-120A to 41-4-151A, incl., 41-4-155A, 41-4-160A to 41-4-168A, incl., 41-4-170 to 41-4-178A, incl., added; Sec. 41-4-66 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 312 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 311 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Orr Amendment Offered |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Taxation General Fund as Favorable |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |