AL SB188 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Assigned Act No. 2014-301.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Assigned Act No. 2014-301.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicle registrations, counties authorized to offer two-year registrations, payment of fees and taxes
Title
Motor vehicle registrations, counties authorized to offer two-year registrations, payment of fees and taxes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Coleman motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Coleman motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-301. |
2014-04-01 | House | Signature Requested |
2014-04-01 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1119 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2014-04-01 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1027 |
2014-04-01 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1026 |
2014-04-01 | House | Public Safety and Homeland Security Amendment Offered |
2014-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2014-01-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Engrossed |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 123 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 122 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Coleman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 121 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |