AL SB192 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-19 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
Pending: House Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-19 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
Pending: House Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Traffic stops, racial profiling by law enforcement officers, prohibited, written policies, forms for statistics, and reports to Attorney General required, provision for complaints
Title
Traffic stops, racial profiling by law enforcement officers, prohibited, written policies, forms for statistics, and reports to Attorney General required, provision for complaints
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-03-25 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-03-25 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-03-25 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-25 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-03-25 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-03-25 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-19 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security | |
2012-04-03 | Engrossed | |
2012-03-22 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 391 | |
2012-03-22 | Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 390 | |
2012-03-22 | Sanford Amendment Offered | |
2012-03-22 | Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 389 | |
2012-03-22 | Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 388 | |
2012-03-22 | Judiciary Amendment Offered | |
2012-03-22 | Judiciary Amendment Offered | |
2012-03-22 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-23 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |