AL SB192 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Assigned Act No. 2018-250.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Assigned Act No. 2018-250.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Agriculture and Conservation Development Commission, allocation of funds to soil and water conservation districts, minimum deleted, Sec. 9-8A-5 am'd.
Title
Agriculture and Conservation Development Commission, allocation of funds to soil and water conservation districts, minimum deleted, Sec. 9-8A-5 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Dial [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2018-250. |
2018-03-08 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2018-03-06 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 615 |
2018-03-06 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-08 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-30 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 199 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry |