AL SB208 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Interstate Compact -Social Work Examiners
Title
Interstate Compact -Social Work Examiners
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 992 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 415 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 415 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Senate | Enacted |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Enacted |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2024-05-02 | House | Signature Requested |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Ready to Enroll |
2024-04-30 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 992 |
2024-04-30 | House | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-04-18 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-09 | House | Pending House Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2024-04-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 415 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Pending Senate Veterans and Military Affairs |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB318 (Same As) 2024-04-23 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar