AL SB229 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Delivered to Governor at 4:17 p.m. on May 7, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Delivered to Governor at 4:17 p.m. on May 7, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Nurses, certified nurse practioners and nurse midwives, Board of Medical Examiners authorized to create Limited Purpose Schedule II permits authorizing the prescribing of certain controlled substances, Secs. 20-2-250 to 20-2-260, inclusive, added; Secs. 20-2-214, 20-2-217 am'd.
Title
Nurses, certified nurse practioners and nurse midwives, Board of Medical Examiners authorized to create Limited Purpose Schedule II permits authorizing the prescribing of certain controlled substances, Secs. 20-2-250 to 20-2-260, inclusive, added; Secs. 20-2-214, 20-2-217 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Reed [R] | Sen. Del Marsh [R] | Sen. J.T. Waggoner [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Reed motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Reed motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | House | Delivered to Governor at 4:17 p.m. on May 7, 2013 |
2013-05-07 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-223. |
2013-05-07 | House | Signature Requested |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-05-07 | House | Hurst intended to vote "Yea" |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2013-05-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1111 |
2013-05-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-24 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 435 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Reed motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 434 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Health Amendment Offered |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health |