AL SB245 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Pending third reading on day 23 Favorable from Health
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Pending third reading on day 23 Favorable from Health
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Eyeglasses, over-the-counter eyeglasses, nonprescription glasses further defined, sale regulated, enforcement
Title
Eyeglasses, over-the-counter eyeglasses, nonprescription glasses further defined, sale regulated, enforcement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Holtzclaw motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Holtzclaw motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Pending third reading on day 23 Favorable from Health |
2016-04-13 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-03-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 335 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Holtzclaw motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 334 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Holtzclaw Amendment Offered |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services |