AL SB245 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Assigned Act No. 2018-401.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Assigned Act No. 2018-401.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Governor, strategic four-year plan, transmit to legislators in electronic format, posting on Governor's website, Sec. 41-19-3 am'd.
Title
Governor, strategic four-year plan, transmit to legislators in electronic format, posting on Governor's website, Sec. 41-19-3 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2018-401. |
2018-03-22 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2018-03-21 | House | Drummond intended to vote "Yea" |
2018-03-21 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 960 |
2018-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-27 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Fiscal Responsibility |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 517 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |