AL SB26 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - Education Appropriations first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - Education Appropriations first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Foundation Program, alternative method for calculating teacher units in certain extreme circumstances, State Superintendent of Education to approve, Sec. 16-13-232 am'd.
Title
Foundation Program, alternative method for calculating teacher units in certain extreme circumstances, State Superintendent of Education to approve, Sec. 16-13-232 am'd.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Education Appropriations first Substitute Offered | |
2010-03-25 | Pending third reading on day 23 Favorable from Education Appropriations with 1 substitute | |
2010-03-25 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2010-02-16 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Appropriations | |
2010-02-16 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 212 | |
2010-02-16 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-11 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-01-12 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |