AL SB26 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 196
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 196
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Drug trafficking, wiretapping by ALEA, interception of wire, oral, or electronic communications, Attorney General authorized to apply for court order for intercept and to apply for intercept orders, disclosure of recorded communications, penalties for violations, Secs. 20-2A-1 to 20-2A-15, inclusive, added
Title
Drug trafficking, wiretapping by ALEA, interception of wire, oral, or electronic communications, Attorney General authorized to apply for court order for intercept and to apply for intercept orders, disclosure of recorded communications, penalties for violations, Secs. 20-2A-1 to 20-2A-15, inclusive, added
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Butler [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 196 (Y: 13 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Butler motion to Adopt Roll Call 195 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - SBIR: Butler motion to Adopt Roll Call 194 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Butler motion to Adopt Roll Call 195 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - SBIR: Butler motion to Adopt Roll Call 194 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 196 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Butler motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 195 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Lost in house of origin |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB17 (Same As) 2022-03-29 - Delivered to Governor at 3:35 p.m. on March 29, 2022.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2A | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 2A | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 2A | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 2A | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 2A | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 2A | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 2A | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 2A | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 2A | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 2A | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 2A | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 2A | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 2A | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 2A | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 2A | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |