AL SB264 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-03 - County and Municipal Government first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-03 - County and Municipal Government first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue Dept., sale of state land, employment of auction company, Sec. 40-10-134 am'd.
Title
Revenue Dept., sale of state land, employment of auction company, Sec. 40-10-134 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | House | County and Municipal Government first Amendment Offered |
2017-05-03 | House | Pending third reading on day 24 Favorable from County and Municipal Government with 1 amendment |
2017-05-03 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2017-04-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 601 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 600 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Pittman Amendment Offered |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 599 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Pittman Amendment Offered |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 598 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development Amendment Offered |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |