AL SB283 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-20 - Pending third reading on day 20 Favorable from Commerce and Small Business
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-20 - Pending third reading on day 20 Favorable from Commerce and Small Business
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Property, Uniform Condo Act, rights to developers and owners, specified, procedures for creation and management, Secs. 35-8A-102, 35-8A-103, 35-8A-105, 35-8A-106, 35-8A-107, 35-8A-201, 35-8A-205, 35-8A-208, 35-8A-209, 35-8A-210, 35-8A-211, 35-8A-214, 35-8A-215, 35-8A-218, 35-8A-220, 35-8A-302, 35-8A-303, 35-8A-304, 35-8A-305, 35-8A-307, 35-8A-310, 35-8A-311, 35-8A-312, 35-8A-313, 35-8A-314, 35-8A-315, 35-8A-316, 35-8A-317, 35-8A-318, 35-8A-401, 35-8A-402, 35-8A-403, 35-8A-404, 35-8A-406, 35-8A-407, 35-8A-408, 35-8A-409, 35-8A-411, 35-8A-412, 35-8A-413, 35-8A-415, 35-8A-417 am'd.
Title
Property, Uniform Condo Act, rights to developers and owners, specified, procedures for creation and management, Secs. 35-8A-102, 35-8A-103, 35-8A-105, 35-8A-106, 35-8A-107, 35-8A-201, 35-8A-205, 35-8A-208, 35-8A-209, 35-8A-210, 35-8A-211, 35-8A-214, 35-8A-215, 35-8A-218, 35-8A-220, 35-8A-302, 35-8A-303, 35-8A-304, 35-8A-305, 35-8A-307, 35-8A-310, 35-8A-311, 35-8A-312, 35-8A-313, 35-8A-314, 35-8A-315, 35-8A-316, 35-8A-317, 35-8A-318, 35-8A-401, 35-8A-402, 35-8A-403, 35-8A-404, 35-8A-406, 35-8A-407, 35-8A-408, 35-8A-409, 35-8A-411, 35-8A-412, 35-8A-413, 35-8A-415, 35-8A-417 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-20 | House | Pending third reading on day 20 Favorable from Commerce and Small Business |
2017-04-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-04-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Engrossed |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 543 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 542 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development Amendment Offered |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |