AL SB285 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Currently Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Currently Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Entertainment Industry Incentive Act of 2009 amended, music albums included as qualified production, minimum qualifications established
Title
Entertainment Industry Incentive Act of 2009 amended, music albums included as qualified production, minimum qualifications established
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | Senate | Currently Indefinitely Postponed |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Pending Senate Finance and Taxation Education |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
Same As/Similar To
HB326 (Same As) 2024-05-08 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar