AL SB29 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-08 - Assigned Act No. 2018-106.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-08 - Assigned Act No. 2018-106.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public Accountancy Board, board composition and powers altered, Secs. 34-1-2, 34-1-3, 34-1-11, 34-1-12 am'd.
Title
Public Accountancy Board, board composition and powers altered, Secs. 34-1-2, 34-1-3, 34-1-11, 34-1-12 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2018-106. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2018-02-08 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 266 |
2018-02-13 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-02-08 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-01 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 57 |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |