AL SB297 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - Pending third reading on day 22 Favorable from County and Municipal Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - Pending third reading on day 22 Favorable from County and Municipal Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cottage food production operations, baked goods and roasted coffees, exempt from obtaining food service permit from health department, labeling of baked goods, other food items, food safety course required, Sec. 22-20-5.1 am'd.
Title
Cottage food production operations, baked goods and roasted coffees, exempt from obtaining food service permit from health department, labeling of baked goods, other food items, food safety course required, Sec. 22-20-5.1 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | House | Pending third reading on day 22 Favorable from County and Municipal Government |
2018-03-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 872 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services |