AL SB309 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State employees, donation of leave for catastrophic, sick, or maternity leave, leave may be donated from employee in any pay grade, limitation on hours donated removed, Sec. 36-26-36.2 am'd.
Title
State employees, donation of leave for catastrophic, sick, or maternity leave, leave may be donated from employee in any pay grade, limitation on hours donated removed, Sec. 36-26-36.2 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Government Operations | |
2010-04-14 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-04-08 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Government Operations | |
2010-04-08 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 915 | |
2010-04-08 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-11 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-02-02 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |