AL SB310 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 14 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 7:03 p.m. on May 14, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 14 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 7:03 p.m. on May 14, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Barbour Co., elected officials authorized to participate in Employees' Retirement System, supernumerary program phased out, const. amend.
Title
Barbour Co., elected officials authorized to participate in Employees' Retirement System, supernumerary program phased out, const. amend.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - House - Motion to Local Application (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 45 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 35 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 35 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State at 7:03 p.m. on May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Local Application adopted Roll Call 666 |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 665 |
2019-05-14 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-07 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 499 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |