AL SB311 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-31 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-31 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Child support, failure to pay, courts authorized to fine and imprison for contempt, Sec. 12-11-30 am'd.
Title
Child support, failure to pay, courts authorized to fine and imprison for contempt, Sec. 12-11-30 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Tammy Irons [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-31 | Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Judiciary | |
2011-05-31 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-26 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary | |
2011-05-25 | Engrossed | |
2011-05-25 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 728 | |
2011-05-25 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 727 | |
2011-05-25 | Judiciary Amendment Offered | |
2011-05-25 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-21 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2011-03-31 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |